THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-746-4540 x 4216
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KALLIE STAPLETON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Stapleton (CPSO#: 106155 )
Business Address: 6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-746-4540 x 4216
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KALLIE STAPLETON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Stapleton (CPSO#: 106155 )
Business Address: 6 Albert St
Parry Sound ON P2A 3A4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALLIE JEAN STAPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAPLETON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALLIE JEAN STAPLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAPLETON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Wollongong, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015