THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0585
Fax: (519) 258-6304
Address: 100-55 Edinborough St
Windsor ON N8X 3C3
Phone: (519) 258-0585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER KAWALA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kawala (CPSO#: 106176 )
Business Address: 55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
(519) 258-0585

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 258-0585
Fax: (519) 258-6304
Address: 100-55 Edinborough St
Windsor ON N8X 3C3
Phone: (519) 258-0585
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. CHRISTOPHER KAWALA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Kawala (CPSO#: 106176 )
Business Address: 55 Edinborough Street
Windsor Ontario N8X 3C3
(519) 258-0585

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KAWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWALA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KAWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAWALA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015