THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 15:14:48 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
Department of Psychiatry
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Family Health Team
133 King St W
Suit 203
Dundas ON L9H 1V3
Phone: 9056674867
Fax: 9056674873

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.M. Chari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pardasani (CPSO#: 106195 ) Dr. V. Chari (CPSO#: 100908 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Firestone Institute for Respiratory Health
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Charlton Campus
Department of Psychiatry
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-522-1155
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Hamilton Family Health Team
133 King St W
Suit 203
Dundas ON L9H 1V3
Phone: 9056674867
Fax: 9056674873

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.M. Chari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Pardasani (CPSO#: 106195 ) Dr. V. Chari (CPSO#: 100908 )
Business Address: St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Firestone Institute for Respiratory Health
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 4A6
(905) 522-1155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVNI PARDASANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDASANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AVNI PARDASANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARDASANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015