THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 04:42:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkview Medical Centre
3695 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521
Address: GSH Medical
801 Eglinton Ave West, Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
Phone: (416) 789-2449
Fax: (416) 789-2253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shivani F. Chandrakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chandrakumar (CPSO#: 106229 ) Dr. A. Deshwar (CPSO#: 115622 )
Business Address: Yorkview Medical Centre
3695 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 633-3711
Business Address: 100 - 801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
(416) 789-2449
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6487

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Yorkview Medical Centre
3695 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 633-3711
Fax: (416) 633-0521
Address: GSH Medical
801 Eglinton Ave West, Suite 100
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
Phone: (416) 789-2449
Fax: (416) 789-2253

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Markdale Site
LOCATION: Markdale

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shivani F. Chandrakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chandrakumar (CPSO#: 106229 ) Dr. A. Deshwar (CPSO#: 115622 )
Business Address: Yorkview Medical Centre
3695 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3J 1N2
(416) 633-3711
Business Address: 100 - 801 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M5N 1E3
(416) 789-2449
Business Address: Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 469-6487

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIVANI FELICIA CHANDRAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRAKUMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIVANI FELICIA CHANDRAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHANDRAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015