THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:53:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bancroft Family Health Team
19 Oak Street
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 332-1565
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Blanchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blanchard (CPSO#: 106233 )
Business Address: 1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 332-2825
Business Address: Bancroft Family Health Team
19 Oak Street
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 332-1565

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bancroft Family Health Team
19 Oak Street
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 332-1565
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft Bancroft
HOSPITAL: Quinte Healthcare North Hastings Bancroft
LOCATION: Bancroft

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Blanchard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blanchard (CPSO#: 106233 )
Business Address: 1-H Manor Lane
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 332-2825
Business Address: Bancroft Family Health Team
19 Oak Street
Bancroft Ontario K0L 1C0
(613) 332-1565

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC ALEXANDRE BLANCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC ALEXANDRE BLANCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015