THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:25:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 73 Leikin Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 355-3498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Balaa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Balaa (CPSO#: 106250 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 73 Leikin Drive
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 713 Montreal Rd
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 355-3498
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 16 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nadia Balaa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Balaa (CPSO#: 106250 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Rd
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
Montfort Hospital
Ottawa ON K1K 0T2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA BALAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALAA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NADIA BALAA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BALAA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015