THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:22:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Plantagenet Family Health Team
179 Old Highway 17
Plantagenet Ontario K0B 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 673-4318
Fax: (613) 673-4480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CLAUDE LAPLANTE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Laplante (CPSO#: 106253 )
Business Address: 179 Old Highway
Plantagenet Ontario K0B 1L0
613-673-4318
Business Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
613-746-4621
Business Address: 879 Hiawatha Park Road
Ottawa Ontario K1C 2Z6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Plantagenet Family Health Team
179 Old Highway 17
Plantagenet Ontario K0B 1L0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 673-4318
Fax: (613) 673-4480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CLAUDE LAPLANTE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Laplante (CPSO#: 106253 )
Business Address: 179 Old Highway
Plantagenet Ontario K0B 1L0
613-673-4318
Business Address: 713 Montréal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
613-746-4621
Business Address: 879 Hiawatha Park Road
Ottawa Ontario K1C 2Z6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDE LAPLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPLANTE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CLAUDE LAPLANTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPLANTE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015