THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:35:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St. Catharines ON L2S 3A1
Phone: 905-688-5550 ext 3243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 106265 )
Business Address: 90 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L9H 7K6
Business Address: 50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W3
(905) 529-4040
Business Address: Suite 400
101 The Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Business Address: 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-21 Front St S
Thorold ON L2V 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St. Catharines ON L2S 3A1
Phone: 905-688-5550 ext 3243
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sarah Chaudhry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chaudhry (CPSO#: 106265 )
Business Address: 90 Dundas Street East
Waterdown Ontario L9H 7K6
Business Address: 50 Dundurn Street South
Hamilton Ontario L8P 4W3
(905) 529-4040
Business Address: Suite 400
101 The Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2P7
Business Address: 1812 Sir Isaac Brock Way
St Catharines Ontario L2S 3A1
Business Address: 245 Pelham Road
St Catharines Ontario L2S 1X8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH CHAUDHRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAUDHRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015