THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:17:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-589 Lake St
St. Catharines ON L2N 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-984-5567
Fax: 905-984-8682
Address: 9-510 North Service Rd
Grimsby ON L3M 0C9
Phone: 289-797-2124
Fax: 289-797-2125
Address: 401-849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
Phone: 9055385100
Fax: 9055385105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faysal Naji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Naji (CPSO#: 106267 )
Business Address: 140 Niagara Street
Suite 101
St Catharines Ontario L2R 4L7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-589 Lake St
St. Catharines ON L2N 7L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-984-5567
Fax: 905-984-8682
Address: 9-510 North Service Rd
Grimsby ON L3M 0C9
Phone: 289-797-2124
Fax: 289-797-2125
Address: 401-849 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton ON L9A 5H4
Phone: 9055385100
Fax: 9055385105

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 04 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 04 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Faysal Naji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jul 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Naji (CPSO#: 106267 )
Business Address: 140 Niagara Street
Suite 101
St Catharines Ontario L2R 4L7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAYSAL NEMAH NAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAYSAL NEMAH NAJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015