THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:04:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Eccles St
Ottawa ON K1R 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132381220
Fax: 6132352982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Li (CPSO#: 106272 )
Business Address: 55 Eccles Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6S3
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 55 Eccles St
Ottawa ON K1R 6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6132381220
Fax: 6132352982

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Li (CPSO#: 106272 )
Business Address: 55 Eccles Street
Ottawa Ontario K1R 6S3
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RACHEL LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 23 Oct 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 May 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015