THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:20:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 Scott Street
Health Canada
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-550-0806
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-298 Glenroy Gilbert Dr
River Tree Health Centre
Nepean ON K2J 5W2
Phone: 6137007737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 108-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
Phone: 613.627.0795
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 566-4470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-1355 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Phone: 613.691.2578
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 102 Lewis St
Integrate Healthcare Collective
Ottawa ON K2P 0S7
Phone: 613-230-7891
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yu Shan Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang (CPSO#: 106299 )
Business Address: Avonmore Medical Clinic
16299 Fairview Drive
Avonmore ON K0C 1C0
613-346-2710
Business Address: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON P0T 2J0
807-887-3026
Business Address: 104-1355 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
613-691-2578
Business Address: 108-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
613- 627-0795

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1600 Scott Street
Health Canada
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4N7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 343-550-0806
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-298 Glenroy Gilbert Dr
River Tree Health Centre
Nepean ON K2J 5W2
Phone: 6137007737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 108-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
Phone: 613.627.0795
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4289 Innes Rd
Orléans ON K1E 0A8
Phone: (613) 566-4470
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 104-1355 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
Phone: 613.691.2578
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 102 Lewis St
Integrate Healthcare Collective
Ottawa ON K2P 0S7
Phone: 613-230-7891
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yu Shan Zhang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Zhang (CPSO#: 106299 )
Business Address: Avonmore Medical Clinic
16299 Fairview Drive
Avonmore ON K0C 1C0
613-346-2710
Business Address: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
566 Louise Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
(613) 774-2420
Business Address: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon ON P0T 2J0
807-887-3026
Business Address: 104-1355 Bank St
Ottawa ON K1H 8K7
613-691-2578
Business Address: 108-152 Cleopatra Dr
Nepean ON K2G 5X2
613- 627-0795

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YU SHAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YU SHAN ZHANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZHANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015