THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:13:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: George Washington University, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's Health In Women's Hands
2 Carlton Street #500
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 593-7655
Extension: 7
Fax: (416) 848-6265
Address: Telemed MD
2200 Dundas st east, Unit 300
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 1-888-350-2323
Fax: 1-833-479-0224
Address: 2050 Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 1X4
Phone: 416-763-1171
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lyndsay O'Brecht Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. O'Brecht (CPSO#: 106305 )
Business Address: 820 King Street North
Unit 1
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4G8
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1H4
Business Address: 60 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1S2
Business Address: Suite 500
379 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8R7
Business Address: 4057 New Street
Burlington Ontario L7L 1S8
Business Address: 344 Dufferin Avenue
Toronto Ontario K8V 5B9
Business Address: 26 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Business Address: Unit 2
59 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 3B8
Business Address: 726 Bloor Street West
Suite 102
Toronto Ontario M6G 4A1
Business Address: 87 Pembrooke
Toronto Ontario M5A 2N9
Business Address: Suite 300
500 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1X9
Business Address: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1L8
Business Address: 74 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario K8V 3P3
Business Address: Coderix Medical Clinic
Suite 101
69 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
(416) 640-2384
Business Address: Unit 3
18 Water Street North
Toronto Ontario N1R 3B1
Business Address: 1640 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A7
Business Address: 277 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1T8
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 222 Lansdowne Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 3C6
Business Address: 160 Main Street
Unit 4
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1N2
Business Address: Suite 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
Business Address: 1488 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6K 3K3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: George Washington University, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Women's Health In Women's Hands
2 Carlton Street #500
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 593-7655
Extension: 7
Fax: (416) 848-6265
Address: Telemed MD
2200 Dundas st east, Unit 300
Mississauga ON L4X 2V3
Phone: 1-888-350-2323
Fax: 1-833-479-0224
Address: 2050 Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 1X4
Phone: 416-763-1171
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lyndsay O'Brecht Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Aug 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. L. O'Brecht (CPSO#: 106305 )
Business Address: 820 King Street North
Unit 1
Waterloo Ontario N2J 4G8
Business Address: 1001 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6S 1H4
Business Address: 60 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1S2
Business Address: Suite 500
379 Bond Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 8R7
Business Address: 4057 New Street
Burlington Ontario L7L 1S8
Business Address: 344 Dufferin Avenue
Toronto Ontario K8V 5B9
Business Address: 26 Dalhousie Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 2A5
Business Address: Unit 2
59 Dundas Street East
Belleville Ontario K8N 3B8
Business Address: 726 Bloor Street West
Suite 102
Toronto Ontario M6G 4A1
Business Address: 87 Pembrooke
Toronto Ontario M5A 2N9
Business Address: Suite 300
500 Yonge Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1X9
Business Address: 250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1L8
Business Address: 74 Dundas Street West
Toronto Ontario K8V 3P3
Business Address: Coderix Medical Clinic
Suite 101
69 Queen Street East
Toronto Ontario M5C 1R8
(416) 640-2384
Business Address: Unit 3
18 Water Street North
Toronto Ontario N1R 3B1
Business Address: 1640 Bloor Street West
Toronto Ontario M6P 1A7
Business Address: 277 Victoria Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1T8
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
East York Ontario M4C 3E7
Business Address: 222 Lansdowne Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6K 3C6
Business Address: 160 Main Street
Unit 4
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1N2
Business Address: Suite 500
2 Carlton Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J3
Business Address: 1488 Queen Street West
Toronto Ontario M6K 3K3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYNDSAY MELISSA O'BRECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRECHT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LYNDSAY MELISSA O'BRECHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'BRECHT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: George Washington University, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015