THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:53:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesia
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058220486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liam Stobart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stobart (CPSO#: 106307 )

Corporation Name: Liam Stobart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Health Sciences North
Department of Anesthesia
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7058220486
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 28 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 28 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liam Stobart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Stobart (CPSO#: 106307 )

Corporation Name: Liam Stobart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 04 Jun 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIAM JOHN STOBART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOBART is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LIAM JOHN STOBART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOBART is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015