THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:08:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk, Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742 0107
Fax: (519) 742 4657
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive Unit 23B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Phone: 519-578-3510
Fax: 519-578-6040
Address: Suite 201
77 John Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W3
Phone: 9058420287
Fax: 2897152010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Singh (CPSO#: 106312 )
Business Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive, Unit 23 B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Address: Medical Centre
208-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 742-0107
Business Address: 201-77 John Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W3
(905) 842-0287

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 430 The Boardwalk, Suite 208
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 742 0107
Fax: (519) 742 4657
Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive Unit 23B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Phone: 519-578-3510
Fax: 519-578-6040
Address: Suite 201
77 John Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W3
Phone: 9058420287
Fax: 2897152010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Singh (CPSO#: 106312 )
Business Address: 421 Greenbrook Drive, Unit 23 B
Kitchener Ontario N2M 4K1
Business Address: Medical Centre
208-430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo Ontario N2T 0C1
(519) 742-0107
Business Address: 201-77 John Street
Oakville Ontario L6K 3W3
(905) 842-0287

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALRAJ SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BALRAJ SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baba Farid University Of Health Sciences, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Nov 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015