THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057341150
Fax: 7057346266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garrett Whyne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Whyne (CPSO#: 106318 )
Business Address: 480 Huronia Road
Suite 206
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 734-1150

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
480 Huronia Road
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057341150
Fax: 7057346266

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Garrett Whyne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 May 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Whyne (CPSO#: 106318 )
Business Address: 480 Huronia Road
Suite 206
Barrie Ontario L4N 6M2
(705) 734-1150

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRETT ROBERT WHYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARRETT ROBERT WHYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHYNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015