THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:57:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3155 Harvester Rd
Suite 101
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 639-1142
Fax: (905) 632-9624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Courtney Sherk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sherk (CPSO#: 106319 )
Business Address: Suite 101
3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
905-639-1172

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3155 Harvester Rd
Suite 101
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 639-1142
Fax: (905) 632-9624

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Courtney Sherk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Feb 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sherk (CPSO#: 106319 )
Business Address: Suite 101
3155 Harvester Rd
Burlington ON L7N 3V2
905-639-1172

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY ELIZABETH SHERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COURTNEY ELIZABETH SHERK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015