THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:36:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 000-000-0000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1112 St. Andrews Dr
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: 000-000-0000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. G. SISTANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sistani (CPSO#: 106320 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201 Georgian Dr
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 000-000-0000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1112 St. Andrews Dr
Georgian Bay General Hospital
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: 000-000-0000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 13 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 03 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 03 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. G. SISTANI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Sistani (CPSO#: 106320 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GOLMEHR SISTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISTANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GOLMEHR SISTANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SISTANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015