THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:27:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit D (Upper)
568 Christina St. North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 344-3371
Fax: (519) 344-3365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Springer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Springer (CPSO#: 106339 )
Business Address: 568 Christina St North
Unit D (Upper)
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit D (Upper)
568 Christina St. North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 344-3371
Fax: (519) 344-3365

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeremy Springer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Springer (CPSO#: 106339 )
Business Address: 568 Christina St North
Unit D (Upper)
Sarnia Ontario N7T 5W6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY EZRA SPRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEREMY EZRA SPRINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SPRINGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015