THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:04:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidad Del Zulia, 1996
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chacon Fonseca Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chacon Fonseca (CPSO#: 106349 )
Business Address: 20 Harness Ridge Dr
Whitby ON L1R 2P4
Business Address: 179 Courtney St
Bowmanville ON L1C 7H4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Universidad Del Zulia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chacon Fonseca Medicine Professional corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Chacon Fonseca (CPSO#: 106349 )
Business Address: 20 Harness Ridge Dr
Whitby ON L1R 2P4
Business Address: 179 Courtney St
Bowmanville ON L1C 7H4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INARA JOSEFINA CHACON FONSECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACON FONSECA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. INARA JOSEFINA CHACON FONSECA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHACON FONSECA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidad Del Zulia, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015