THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:01:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehrdad Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rouhani (CPSO#: 106354 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 28 Jul 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 28 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehrdad Rouhani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Apr 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rouhani (CPSO#: 106354 )
Business Address: 825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRDAD ROUHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUHANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHRDAD ROUHANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROUHANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 05 Aug 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015