THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:15:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Rafiq, Mamoona (Used Until: 24 Aug 2020)
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Disera Drive
Unit 100
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-771-7755
Fax: 905-771-7752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mamoona Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mirza (CPSO#: 106355 )
Business Address: 210-31 Disera Dr
Thornhill ON L4J 0A7
905-771-7755
Business Address: 31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON P5A 1Y9
705-461-8882

General Information

Former Name: Rafiq, Mamoona (Used Until: 24 Aug 2020)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Disera Drive
Unit 100
Thornhill Ontario L4J 0A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-771-7755
Fax: 905-771-7752

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jul 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 27 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mamoona Mirza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mirza (CPSO#: 106355 )
Business Address: 210-31 Disera Dr
Thornhill ON L4J 0A7
905-771-7755
Business Address: 31 Nova Scotia Walk
Elliot Lake ON P5A 1Y9
705-461-8882

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAMOONA MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAMOONA MIRZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MIRZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015