THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:13:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Phone: 9058979228
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S DE FREITAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. De Freitas (CPSO#: 106357 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore road
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B6
Phone: 9058979228
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S DE FREITAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. De Freitas (CPSO#: 106357 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ANGELA DE FREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE FREITAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA ANGELA DE FREITAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE FREITAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015