THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:57:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2Z 1G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4285
Address: Emergency Dept.
200 Terrace Hill St. Brantford, ON.
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-752-7871
Fax: 519-751-5570
Address: 1199 Queen Street, Kincardine, ON
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
Phone: (519) 396-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Dept.
835 King St. W, Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4285
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 McGivern St. W
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
Phone: (519) 881-1220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KUN HUH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Huh (CPSO#: 106369 )
Business Address: 202-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON N1H 1B1
6479697814

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2Z 1G6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4285
Address: Emergency Dept.
200 Terrace Hill St. Brantford, ON.
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-752-7871
Fax: 519-751-5570
Address: 1199 Queen Street, Kincardine, ON
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 1G6
Phone: (519) 396-3331
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Emergency Dept.
835 King St. W, Kitchener, ON
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Phone: 519-749-4300
Fax: 519-749-4285
Address: 2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 21 McGivern St. W
Walkerton Ontario N0G 2V0
Phone: (519) 881-1220
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site Walkerton
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton Site
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KUN HUH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Huh (CPSO#: 106369 )
Business Address: 202-83 Dawson Rd
Guelph ON N1H 1B1
6479697814

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUN HUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KUN HUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HUH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015