THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:13:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 210
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055824111
Fax: 2898371007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maysam Khalfan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khalfan (CPSO#: 106370 )
Business Address: 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 210
Oakville ON L6M4J2
(905) 582 4111

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 210
Oakville Ontario L6M 4J2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055824111
Fax: 2898371007

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 07 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst) Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Hopital Notre-Dame Hospital (Hearst)
LOCATION: Hearst

HOSPITAL: Sensenbrenner Hospital
LOCATION: Kapuskasing

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maysam Khalfan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khalfan (CPSO#: 106370 )
Business Address: 2525 Old Bronte Rd
Suite 210
Oakville ON L6M4J2
(905) 582 4111

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYSAM MUNAWER KHALFAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALFAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYSAM MUNAWER KHALFAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALFAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Apr 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015