THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:34:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197515544
Fax: 5197515817
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Center
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Extension: 6696
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 720 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2R4
Phone: 416-979-3939
Fax: 416-364-9692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Weiss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weiss (CPSO#: 106372 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON N3R 1G9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197515544
Fax: 5197515817
Address: 30 The Queensway
St Joseph's Health Center
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 4165306000
Extension: 6696
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 720 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 2R4
Phone: 416-979-3939
Fax: 416-364-9692

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Weiss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Dec 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Weiss (CPSO#: 106372 )
Business Address: 200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
(519) 751-5544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA HILLEL SAMUEL WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSHUA HILLEL SAMUEL WEISS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015