THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:46:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4256 Bathurst St
Suite 306
North York ON M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-3011
Fax: 416-221-3097
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Li Yang Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Liu (CPSO#: 106374 )
Business Address: Suite 306
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 222-3011

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4256 Bathurst St
Suite 306
North York ON M3H 5Y8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-222-3011
Fax: 416-221-3097
Address: 596 Davis Dr
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Li Yang Liu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Liu (CPSO#: 106374 )
Business Address: Suite 306
4256 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M3H 5Y8
(416) 222-3011

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LI YANG LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LI YANG LIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015