THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère St
Elisabeth Bruyère Hospital
Bruyère Memory Program
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 562 6322
Fax: 613 562 6013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Apr 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krista Whitney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Whitney (CPSO#: 106394 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
6135626322

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère St
Elisabeth Bruyère Hospital
Bruyère Memory Program
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 562 6322
Fax: 613 562 6013

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 21 Apr 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 21 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Krista Whitney Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Whitney (CPSO#: 106394 )
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
6135626322

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA ANN WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISTA ANN WHITNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WHITNEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015