THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:42:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Frood Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 4Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 670-2274
Fax: (705) 670-2277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patrie (CPSO#: 106400 )
Business Address: 19 Frood Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 4Y9
(705) 670-2274
Business Address: 3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
(705) 855-1018
Business Address: Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 19 Frood Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 4Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 670-2274
Fax: (705) 670-2277

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patrie (CPSO#: 106400 )
Business Address: 19 Frood Road
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3C 4Y9
(705) 670-2274
Business Address: 3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford Ontario P0M 1L0
(705) 855-1018
Business Address: Postgraduate Medical Education
Northern Ontario School of Medicine
935 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 2C6
(705) 675-4883

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE FLORENCE PATRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELANIE FLORENCE PATRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATRIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015