THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:30:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Gastroenterology
13 MP 302
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5949
Fax: 416-603-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P TANDON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tandon (CPSO#: 106411 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Main pavillion
13th Floor
Room 302
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Western Hospital
Gastroenterology
13 MP 302
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-603-5949
Fax: 416-603-6204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P TANDON MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tandon (CPSO#: 106411 )
Business Address: 399 Bathurst Street
Main pavillion
13th Floor
Room 302
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARUL TANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PARUL TANDON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michigan State University (Osteopathic), 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015