THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:10:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Magenta Health
418 Eglinton Ave W, 2nd floor
Toronto ON
M5N1A2
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 437-317-9614
Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: 888-930-6571
Fax: 855-967-2945
Address: 2956 Highway 69 N
Unit 2
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1E3
Phone: 1-888-637-5485
Fax: 705-805-0194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa L. Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldberg (CPSO#: 106429 )
Business Address: 200-418 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A2
647-479-8410

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Magenta Health
418 Eglinton Ave W, 2nd floor
Toronto ON
M5N1A2
Toronto Ontario M5N 1A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 437-317-9614
Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: 888-930-6571
Fax: 855-967-2945
Address: 2956 Highway 69 N
Unit 2
Val Caron Ontario P3N 1E3
Phone: 1-888-637-5485
Fax: 705-805-0194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa L. Goldberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Goldberg (CPSO#: 106429 )
Business Address: 200-418 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A2
647-479-8410

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA LAUREN GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MELISSA LAUREN GOLDBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GOLDBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015