THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:25:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sawula and Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith (CPSO#: 106474 ) Dr. H. Sawula (CPSO#: 106434 )
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
705 789 2311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Ann Street
Bracebridge Ontario P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-4404
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Phone: (705) 325-2201
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sawula and Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Smith (CPSO#: 106474 ) Dr. H. Sawula (CPSO#: 106434 )
Business Address: 100 Frank Miller Dr
Huntsville ON P1H 1H7
705 789 2311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER MARIAN SAWULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWULA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HEATHER MARIAN SAWULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAWULA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015