THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:09:42 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Sherway Dr
suite 109
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166200654
Fax: 4166206689
Address: 15 Maple Ave
suite 4
Barrie ON L4N 2N6
Phone: 249-888-8825
Fax: 705-915-1001
Address: 15 Maple Avenue
suite 4
Barrie Ontario L4N 2N6
Phone: 249-359-8849
Fax: 705-915-1001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monica Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yu (CPSO#: 106436 )
Business Address: 190 Sherway Dr
suite 109
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
416-620-0654

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 190 Sherway Dr
suite 109
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4166200654
Fax: 4166206689
Address: 15 Maple Ave
suite 4
Barrie ON L4N 2N6
Phone: 249-888-8825
Fax: 705-915-1001
Address: 15 Maple Avenue
suite 4
Barrie Ontario L4N 2N6
Phone: 249-359-8849
Fax: 705-915-1001

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 15 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Monica Yu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yu (CPSO#: 106436 )
Business Address: 190 Sherway Dr
suite 109
Etobicoke ON M9C 5N2
416-620-0654

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA TZE HA YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MONICA TZE HA YU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015