THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:53:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-245 West Beaver Creek Road
York Dermatology Clinic & Research Centre
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-7997
Fax: 905-883-7994
Address: 1176 Division St
SKiN Centre for Dermatology
Cobourg ON K9A 0Z4
Phone: 289-252-2366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 775 Monaghan Road
SKiN Centre for Dermatology
Peterborough Ontario K9J 5K2
Phone: 705-775-7546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Rajakulendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rajakulendran (CPSO#: 106441 )
Business Address: 2-245 West Beaver Creek Road
York Dermatology Clinic & Research Centre
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1L1
905-883-7997
Business Address: 1176 Division St
Cobourg ON K9A 0Z4
289-252-2366
Business Address: 775 Monaghan Road
Peterborough Ontario K9J 5K2
705-775-7546

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-245 West Beaver Creek Road
York Dermatology Clinic & Research Centre
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-883-7997
Fax: 905-883-7994
Address: 1176 Division St
SKiN Centre for Dermatology
Cobourg ON K9A 0Z4
Phone: 289-252-2366
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 775 Monaghan Road
SKiN Centre for Dermatology
Peterborough Ontario K9J 5K2
Phone: 705-775-7546
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Rajakulendran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rajakulendran (CPSO#: 106441 )
Business Address: 2-245 West Beaver Creek Road
York Dermatology Clinic & Research Centre
Richmond Hill Ontario L4B 1L1
905-883-7997
Business Address: 1176 Division St
Cobourg ON K9A 0Z4
289-252-2366
Business Address: 775 Monaghan Road
Peterborough Ontario K9J 5K2
705-775-7546

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THANASHAN RAJAKULENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAKULENDRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. THANASHAN RAJAKULENDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJAKULENDRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015