THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
11/05/25 05:37:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Extension: 11210
Fax: (905) 428-8277
Address: PO Box 1800 Stn Main
381 Church Street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: 905-472-7026
Address: G1-145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: (416) 640-2072
Address: Seneca Medical Centre
1750 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
Phone: 416-491-5050
Extension: 22965
Fax: 416-493-8319

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Ding Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ding (CPSO#: 106456 )
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-2702 Extn: 2214
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: G2652 - 1750 Finch Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
(416) 491-5050 Extn: 22965

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 580 Harwood Ave S
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Extension: 11210
Fax: (905) 428-8277
Address: PO Box 1800 Stn Main
381 Church Street
Markham ON L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: 905-472-7026
Address: G1-145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: (416) 640-2072
Address: Seneca Medical Centre
1750 Finch Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
Phone: 416-491-5050
Extension: 22965
Fax: 416-493-8319

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan Ding Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Apr 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ding (CPSO#: 106456 )
Business Address: 100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville Ontario L9W 4X8
(519) 941-2702 Extn: 2214
Business Address: 580 Harwood Ave S
Ajax ON L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: G2652 - 1750 Finch Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2J 2X5
(416) 491-5050 Extn: 22965

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN YIN CHONG DING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN YIN CHONG DING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015