THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:39:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 620 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
12-080
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-4501
Extension: 4270
Fax: 416-946-2866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicolas Chin-Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chin-Yee (CPSO#: 106459 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 620 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 620 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
12-080
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-946-4501
Extension: 4270
Fax: 416-946-2866

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Palliative Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Palliative Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicolas Chin-Yee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Mar 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Chin-Yee (CPSO#: 106459 )
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 620 University Avenue
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLAS JAMES CHIN-YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN-YEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NICOLAS JAMES CHIN-YEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHIN-YEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015