THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-1729 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-714-8877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 402-885 Meadowlands Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 3N2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BAHUBESHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahubeshi (CPSO#: 106464 )
Business Address: 4-224 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 304-1729 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 7Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-714-8877
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 402-885 Meadowlands Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 3N2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Dermatology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Dermatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: BAHUBESHI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bahubeshi (CPSO#: 106464 )
Business Address: 4-224 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED-AMIN BAHUBESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHUBESHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMED-AMIN BAHUBESHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAHUBESHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015