THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:08:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 - 1170 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 281-9337
Fax: (905) 281-9849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fung (CPSO#: 106466 )
Business Address: 9 - 1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E6
(905) 281-9337

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 9 - 1170 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 281-9337
Fax: (905) 281-9849

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christina Fung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Fung (CPSO#: 106466 )
Business Address: 9 - 1170 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4E6
(905) 281-9337

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA HOI LING FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINA HOI LING FUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015