THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meadowlands Family Health Centre
16 - 888 Meadowlands Dr E
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bardsley Chhabra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chhabra (CPSO#: 107099 ) Dr. J. Bardsley (CPSO#: 106471 )
Business Address: 888 Meadowlands Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 3R2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Meadowlands Family Health Centre
16 - 888 Meadowlands Dr E
Ottawa Ontario K2C 3R2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 228-2882
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Phone: 6137985555
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bardsley Chhabra Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Chhabra (CPSO#: 107099 ) Dr. J. Bardsley (CPSO#: 106471 )
Business Address: 888 Meadowlands Dr
Ottawa ON K2C 3R2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILLIAN ASHLYNN BARDSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDSLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JILLIAN ASHLYNN BARDSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARDSLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015