THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:09:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Mousseau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mousseau (CPSO#: 106475 )
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400 Extn: 7254

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 89 Norman St
Sarnia Ontario N7T6S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Mousseau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Dec 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mousseau (CPSO#: 106475 )
Business Address: 89 Norman Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6S3
(519) 464-4400 Extn: 7254

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK JAMES MOUSSEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSEAU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK JAMES MOUSSEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSEAU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015