THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:30:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-455-1331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tupur Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rahman (CPSO#: 106483 )
Business Address: 201-366 Main St N
Brampton ON L6V 1P8
9054551331

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queen Square Doctors
Suite 201
366 Main Street North
Brampton Ontario L6V1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-455-1331
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tupur Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rahman (CPSO#: 106483 )
Business Address: 201-366 Main St N
Brampton ON L6V 1P8
9054551331

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUPUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TUPUR RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015