THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:52:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket, Ontario
L3Y 2P9
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 895 4521
Extension: 6619
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church St
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leung (CPSO#: 106484 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P9
(905) 472-7000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket, Ontario
L3Y 2P9
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 895 4521
Extension: 6619
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church St
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C4Z3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 15 Oct 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 15 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Leung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Leung (CPSO#: 106484 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521
Business Address: 10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 1Z3
(905) 883-1212
Business Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Ontario L3P 7P9
(905) 472-7000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015