THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:37:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto Ontario M6C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5059
Address: 105 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M1L0
Phone: 519-482-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L1L9
Phone: 905-985-7321
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A5T8
Phone: 519-508-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Primacy - Carlton & Church Medical
60 Carlton St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J2
Phone: 416-646-1890
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 605 Royal York Rd
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Phone: 416-800-6500
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Stokes St
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Medicine in Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mackenzie (CPSO#: 106499 )
Business Address: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
416-603-5888

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto Western Family Health Team
Garrison Creek
Toronto Ontario M6C 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5059
Address: 105 Shipley Street
Clinton Ontario N0M1L0
Phone: 519-482-3000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 451 Paxton Street
Port Perry Ontario L9L1L9
Phone: 905-985-7321
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford Ontario N5A5T8
Phone: 519-508-1212
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Primacy - Carlton & Church Medical
60 Carlton St
Toronto Ontario M5B 1J2
Phone: 416-646-1890
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 605 Royal York Rd
Toronto Ontario M8Y 4G5
Phone: 416-800-6500
Extension: 1
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Stokes St
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Medicine in Psychiatry
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site Lions Head
Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site
LOCATION: Port Perry

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Lions Head Site
LOCATION: Lions Head

HOSPITAL: Manitoulin Health Centre Mindemoya Site
LOCATION: Mindemoya

HOSPITAL: Stratford General Hospital
LOCATION: Stratford

HOSPITAL: Clinton Public Hospital
LOCATION: Clinton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anna Mackenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Mackenzie (CPSO#: 106499 )
Business Address: 928 St Clair Ave W
Toronto ON M6C 1C6
416-603-5888

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA KATHERINE GILES MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNA KATHERINE GILES MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015