THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:08:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. IDREES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Idrees (CPSO#: 106506 )
Business Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
5197443311
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
5197423611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. IDREES MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jul 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Idrees (CPSO#: 106506 )
Business Address: 911 Queens Blvd
Kitchener ON N2M 1B2
5197443311
Business Address: PO Box 9056 Stn C
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
5197423611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHWISH IDREES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IDREES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEHWISH IDREES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IDREES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015