THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:12:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 836 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 3A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 385 6777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 116
284 Queen St East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-455-6464
Fax: (905) 264-1976
Address: 2467 Bloor St. W
Etobicoke, ON
Etobicoke Ontario M6S1P7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (844) 515-5154
Address: 880 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton ON L9A 5H2
Phone: 905-575-0808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Health Centre at Mohawk College
135 Fennell Avenue West, Room C109
Hamilton Ontario L9C1E9
Phone: 2892376538
Fax: 9055752416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faizah Ilyas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ilyas (CPSO#: 106509 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 836 Upper James Street
Hamilton Ontario L9C 3A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 385 6777
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Unit 116
284 Queen St East
Brampton Ontario L6V 1C2
Phone: 905-455-6464
Fax: (905) 264-1976
Address: 2467 Bloor St. W
Etobicoke, ON
Etobicoke Ontario M6S1P7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: (844) 515-5154
Address: 880 Upper Wentworth St
Hamilton ON L9A 5H2
Phone: 905-575-0808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Health Centre at Mohawk College
135 Fennell Avenue West, Room C109
Hamilton Ontario L9C1E9
Phone: 2892376538
Fax: 9055752416

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Faizah Ilyas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jul 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ilyas (CPSO#: 106509 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZAH ILYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILYAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAIZAH ILYAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ILYAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015