THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:16:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health - Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa, ON L1G 2B9
Oshawa Ontario L9P 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ankit Rastogi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi (CPSO#: 106512 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health-Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lakeridge Health - Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa, ON L1G 2B9
Oshawa Ontario L9P 1R1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-576-8711
Extension: 0
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ankit Rastogi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi (CPSO#: 106512 )
Business Address: Lakeridge Health-Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa Ontario L1G 2B9
(905) 576-8711

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANKIT RASTOGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASTOGI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANKIT RASTOGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASTOGI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015