THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:26:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: (905) 497-7748
Address: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Unit 340
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: (905) 497-7748

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hassan Masoom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Masoom (CPSO#: 106513 )
Business Address: 10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Unit 205
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-7747

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 205-10 Cottrelle Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: (905) 497-7748
Address: 135 Queens Plate Drive
Unit 340
Toronto Ontario M9W 6V1
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: (905) 497-7748

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hassan Masoom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Masoom (CPSO#: 106513 )
Business Address: 10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Unit 205
Brampton Ontario L6S 0E2
(905) 497-7747

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSAN MASOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASOOM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HASSAN MASOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MASOOM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015