THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-111 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4S4
Phone: 647-625-8799
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-1939 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
Phone: (647)-625-8799
Fax: 1-877-269-0507
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6580
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Neil E. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. D'Souza (CPSO#: 106525 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 825 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital
East York ON M4C 3E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164618272
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-111 Simcoe St N
Oshawa ON L1G 4S4
Phone: 647-625-8799
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2-1939 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough ON M1P 2L9
Phone: (647)-625-8799
Fax: 1-877-269-0507
Address: Department of Emergency Medicine
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-469-6580
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 08 Nov 2021
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Neil E. D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. N. D'Souza (CPSO#: 106525 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL ERIC PATRICK D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL ERIC PATRICK D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015