THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:24:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-953-7917
Fax: 905-953-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KARIM TAHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Taha (CPSO#: 106527 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
905-895-4521 Extn: 2974
Business Address: 75 Ann St
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
705-645-4404

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 602-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-953-7917
Fax: 905-953-0046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Mar 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 12 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. KARIM TAHA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Taha (CPSO#: 106527 )
Business Address: 596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
905-895-4521 Extn: 2974
Business Address: 75 Ann St
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
705-645-4404

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM TAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARIM TAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAHA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015