THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12270 Yonge Street
Unit 5
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-291-1889
Fax: 289-870-2986

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KINSEY LAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lam (CPSO#: 106540 )
Business Address: 12270 Yonge Street
Unit 5
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3M7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 12270 Yonge Street
Unit 5
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3M7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-291-1889
Fax: 289-870-2986

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: KINSEY LAM MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Oct 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lam (CPSO#: 106540 )
Business Address: 12270 Yonge Street
Unit 5
Richmond Hill Ontario L4E 3M7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KINSEY LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KINSEY LAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015