THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:00:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8078875252
Fax: 8078871645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Foulds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Foulds (CPSO#: 106565 )
Business Address: Nipigon Memorial Hospital
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-2421

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8078875252
Fax: 8078871645

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 May 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Foulds Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Foulds (CPSO#: 106565 )
Business Address: Nipigon Memorial Hospital
125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-2421

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD FOULDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOULDS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT EDWARD FOULDS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOULDS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015